THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:23:05 PM
Gamache, Nathalie Danielle
CPSO#:
73541
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nathalie Gamache Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
PO Box 47014
Denman Place Mall
Vancouver, BC V6G 3E1
[email protected]
Date Received: 31 May 2018
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Gamache at: [email protected].
Date Received: 12 Sep 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:15 Aug 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 21 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 20 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |