THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:35:01 AM
Yeh, Eluen Ann
CPSO#:
73509
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Yeh, Ellen Ann (used until: 06 Jul 1999 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, Japanese
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7353
Fax: (416) 813-6334
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Aug 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELUEN ANN YEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2003 |