THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:45:15 AM
Noora, Joseph
CPSO#:
73500
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Cardiovascular Associates
Suite 402
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-2550
Fax: (905) 848-5037
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH NOORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2006 |