THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:05:07 PM
Rhemtulla, El-Karim Fatehali Jaffer
CPSO#:
73467
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu
Education: University of Cambridge School of Clinic, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
3460 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 684-8521
Fax: (905) 684-4996
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EL-KARIM FATEHALI JAFFER RHEMTULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEMTULLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2004 |