THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 13:14:07 PM
Barlas, Joanna
CPSO#:
73460
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 Apr 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANNA BARLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARLAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 11 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 11 Mar 2005
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2006 |