THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:51:33 PM
Mallouh, Suzy Zahida
CPSO#:
73451
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2310
Fax: (905) 883-2008
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Mallouh’s medical record requests from the former Family Care Physicians Walk-in Cliniccan be obtained by writing to:
Dr. E. Welchner, Medical Director
69 Wellington Street East
Aurora, Ontario
L4G 1H7
Tel: 905-503-8000
Fax: 905-503-8100
Date Received: 01 Aug 2012
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUZY ZAHIDA MALLOUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLOUH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2001 |