THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:05:21 AM
Perng, Richard John
CPSO#:
73418
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 358-0171 Ext. 53403
Fax: (905) 358-4908
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN PERNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 10 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2004 |