THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 11:37:32 AM
Klapwyk, Linda Anne
CPSO#:
73414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Dec 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON M6R 3A6
Phone: (416) 766-2718
Fax: (416) 766-0196
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Klapwyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LINDA ANNE KLAPWYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAPWYK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2001 |