THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:37:58 AM
Leone, James Mauro
CPSO#:
73410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Fax: (519) 624-1117
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Leone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 11 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES MAURO LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |