THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:06:34 AM
Jahromi, Afshin
CPSO#:
73402
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
693 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 1P1
Phone: 519-585-2145
Fax: 519-836-1793
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AFSHIN JAHROMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHROMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |