THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:34:00 PM
Johnston, Robert Smith
CPSO#:
73400
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Oct 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 613-725-9965 Ext. 893
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT SMITH JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2004 |