THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:30:24 PM
Sichler, Conrad John
CPSO#:
73384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
86 Homewood Ave
Hamilton ON L8P 2M4
Phone: 9053335001
Fax: 9056339888
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CONRAD JOHN SICHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SICHLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2001 |