THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:15:00 AM
Huzel, Lisa Louise
CPSO#:
73367
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 May 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:22 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LISA LOUISE HUZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUZEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1999 |