THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:44:36 PM
Ferreira, Ivone Martins
CPSO#:
73366
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 220 B 340 College Street
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 966-2525
Fax: (416) 944-2525
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVONE MARTINS FERREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREIRA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 May 2002
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 May 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |