THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:22:31 AM
Chang, Genevieve
CPSO#:
73349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
23 Bolton Avenue
Newmarket ON L3Y 2X3
Phone: (905) 895-8270
Fax: (905) 895-8227
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:21 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 May 1999 to 22 Jun 1999
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2000 |