THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:52:39 AM
Urson, Shoshana
CPSO#:
73348
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Feb 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Lithuanian, Russian, Yiddish
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Urson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 May 1999 to 25 May 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2023 |