THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:12:57 AM
Kives, Sari Leanne
CPSO#:
73346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Apr 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Fifth Floor
61 Queen St E
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7480
Fax: (416) 867-7478
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARI LEANNE KIVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIVES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2003 |