THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:55:05 PM
Khotianov, Natan Lvovitch
CPSO#:
73322
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Grodno State Medical Institute, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
5927 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M2R 3T5
Phone: (416) 512-2651
Fax: (416) 512-2653
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATAN LVOVITCH KHOTIANOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOTIANOV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 24 May 2000
CF - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 May 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2005 |