THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:46:16 AM
Arnold, Donald Mitchell
CPSO#:
73317
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre 3H50
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 28603
Fax: (905) 524-2983
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:23 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD MITCHELL ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 1999 to 02 May 1999
EL - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Clinician Investigator
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |