THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:32:41 PM
Eikelboom, John William Andrew
CPSO#:
73308
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Apr 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
11 Apr 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The University of Western Australia Facu, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC General Hospital Campus
Thrombosis Service McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40323
Fax: (905) 521-1551
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:03 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM ANDREW EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. EIKELBOOM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
CF - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 01 Jul 2000
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2007 |