THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:00:30 PM
Rice, Jill Lorraine
CPSO#:
73305
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Street North
Bruyere-St Vincent site
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Phone: 613-562-6398
Fax: 613-562-6394
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JILL LORRAINE RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 1999 to 27 Apr 1999
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Apr 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2001 |