THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:58:54 PM
Akingbola, Olurotimi Akintayo
CPSO#:
73290
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
unit 110-419 King Street West
The galleria
Oshawa Mall
Oshawa ON L1J 2H9
Phone: 9056685560
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:04 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLUROTIMI AKINTAYO AKINGBOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINGBOLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Mar 1999 to 28 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2000 |