THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:28:07 PM
Hota, Lakshmi Bhramara Valli
CPSO#:
73281
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Telugu
Education: Andhra University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Valli Hota Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents looking for a copy of their medical records should contact:
Docudavit Solutions
Phone: 416-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 21 Sep 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2019 |