THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:18:17 PM
Gutierrez, Carlos Alfredo
CPSO#:
73272
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |