THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 13:11:19 PM
McCartney, Colin John Lindsay
CPSO#:
73247
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
M3-200
Department of Anesthesia
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 4864
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN LINDSAY MCCARTNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Mar 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Mar 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2005 |