THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:25:44 PM
Mehdian, Hossein
CPSO#:
73227
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 416-850-4064
Fax: 416-850-6681
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOSSEIN MEHDIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHDIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |