THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:42:19 AM
Li, Bessie
CPSO#:
73220
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 29
7010 Warden Avenue
Markham ON L3R 5Y3
Phone: (905) 944-0270
Fax: (905) 513-6634
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BESSIE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 10 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 10 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2001 |