THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:25:51 AM
Qureshy, Kamran Saleem
CPSO#:
73200
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9401 Jane Street
Suite 123
Vaughan ON L6A 4H7
Phone: (905) 553-4232
Fax: (905) 553-6232
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:12 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAMRAN SALEEM QURESHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 28 Feb 1999
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2002 |