THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:06:29 AM
Shah, Prakeshkumar Shantilal
CPSO#:
73197
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Gujarat University, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19 231P
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4761
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRAKESHKUMAR SHANTILAL SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2004 |