THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:36:49 PM
Chakroborty, Amitabha
CPSO#:
73193
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Calcutta, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinsky Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Amitabha Chakroborty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Jul 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMITABHA CHAKROBORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKROBORTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2006 to 06 Oct 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 07 Oct 2006 to 23 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2007 to 23 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2009 |