THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:13:38 PM
Choudhry, Ashwani
CPSO#:
73148
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Nov 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON L4T 4E3
Phone: (905) 676-0006
Fax: (855)716 8821
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHWANI CHOUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUDHRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 1998 |