THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:18:37 AM
Pozgay, Anita Maria
CPSO#:
73144
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Apr 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Apr 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
12-585 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 4K4
Phone: 6138420444
Fax: 6135186546
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A.M. Pozgay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANITA MARIA POZGAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POZGAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 1998 to 10 Jan 1999
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2001 |