THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:58:08 PM
Emelianova, Svetlana Vladislavovna
CPSO#:
73143
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Second Moscow Order of Lenin Medical Ins, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Champagne Outpatient Services Centr
2 Champagne Drive
south entrance, E8
Toronto ON M2J 0K2
Phone: (416)-756-6919
Fax: (416)-756-6318
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SVETLANA VLADISLAVOVNA EMELIANOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMELIANOVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2006 |