THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:39:28 AM
Clark, Russell Peter
CPSO#:
73141
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Nov 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Nov 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5E1
Phone: (807) 343-8936
Fax: (807) 766-7226
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUSSELL PETER CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 1998 |