THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:37:46 PM
Cheema, Asim Nazir
CPSO#:
73132
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
113-1055 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON L4W 0C2
Phone: (416) 620-9600
Fax: (416) 620-9620
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:11 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASIM NAZIR CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Nov 2000
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2001 |