THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:14:07 AM
Freedman, Dayna Miriam
CPSO#:
73128
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-1588
Fax: (416) 281-0939
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAYNA MIRIAM FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Nov 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2001 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On May 31, 2016, at the Supreme Court of British Columbia, Vancouver, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Freedman, in respect of an incident that took place in September 1999.