THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:35:32 AM
Withers, Nicholas Joseph
CPSO#:
73096
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1111 4th Ave
Ladysmith Community Health Centre
Urgent Care
Ladysmith BC V9G 1R3
Phone: 2507395777
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nicholas J. Withers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Northwest Territories
Yukon
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:21 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Nov 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS JOSEPH WITHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITHERS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |