THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:59:41 AM
Akbari, Ayub
CPSO#:
73060
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Suite 5-25
1967 Riverside
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82537
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:29 Apr 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AYUB AKBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKBARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Sep 1998 to 13 Sep 1999
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1999 |