THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 19:36:35 PM
Tharmaratnam, Umamaheswary
CPSO#:
73051
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Colombo, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2414, Camilla road
Mississauga ON L5A2K5
Phone: 6475235270
Fax: 905 276 5732
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Umamaheswary Tharmaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:11 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. UMAMAHESWARY THARMARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARMARATNAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 1998 to 14 Sep 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1998 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |