THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:20:01 AM
Salem, Khaled Yousef Salah El-Din
CPSO#:
73023
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Ann Street,
Bracebridge, ON P1L
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Phone: 705-645-4404
Fax: 705-645-4594
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Khal Salem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Attention Dr Alfi Beshay
165 Plymouth Road
Welland, Ontario
Date Received: 27 Jan 2010
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALED YOUSEF SALAH EL-DIN SALEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2017 |