THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:41:22 PM
Walele, Abdul Aziz
CPSO#:
73022
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Zimbabwe, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
624-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 0A9
Phone: 416-748-0238
Fax: 905-497-6114
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:31 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDUL AZIZ WALELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALELE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2000 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2008 |