THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:22:22 AM
Abu Rafea, Basim Fouad A
CPSO#:
73020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Abu Rafeh, Basem Fouad A (used until: 11 Oct 2004 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
373 Commissioners Rd W
London ON N6J 1Y4
Phone: 519-663-3019
Fax: 519-685-5519
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BASIM FOUAD A ABU RAFEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU RAFEA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 19 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Aug 1999 to 19 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Aug 2000 to 19 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Aug 2001 to 19 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2019 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2024 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2024 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |