THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:45:11 PM
Jones, Griffith David
CPSO#:
73009
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8551
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRIFFITH DAVID JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 13 Jan 2003
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2003 |