THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:19:01 AM
Ohson, Kamal Krishna Singh
CPSO#:
72999
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Bombay, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 1999 |
CFPC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 20 Aug 1998 to 16 Sep 1998
EL - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |