THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:26:08 PM
Zubair, Naeem Ahmad
CPSO#:
72986
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Department of Anaesthesia
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
|
Active |