THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:37:31 PM
McKenzie, Kim Robert
CPSO#:
72978
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
121 Wellington Street West
Suite 214
Barrie ON L4N 1L2
Phone: (705) 733-4061
Fax: (705) 733-4063
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: K.R. McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2009
Corporation Name: K.R. McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIM ROBERT MCKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKENZIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1998 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2019 |