THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:14:06 PM
Beshay, Sanaa Seliman
CPSO#:
72973
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
12-1235 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 0G4
Phone: 9052680188
Fax: 9052680181
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Beshay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:27 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANAA SELIMAN BESHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1998 |