THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:45:42 PM
Lai, Lillian Suke-Woon
CPSO#:
72948
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, French, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Cardiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2889
Fax: 6137384835
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LILLIAN SUKE-WOON LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Jul 1998 to 21 Aug 1998
EL - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Aug 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2001 |