THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:19:13 PM
Mirsattari, Seyed Mohammad
CPSO#:
72937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian, Turkish
Education: Queen's University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences - LHSC
University Campus, Room B10 - 106
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3348
Fax: (519) 663-3440
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEYED MOHAMMAD MIRSATTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRSATTARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 18 Nov 1998
EL - Neurology
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 1998 to 16 Dec 1998
EL - Neurology
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 1998 to 13 Jan 1999
EL - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 1999 to 10 Feb 1999
EL - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Feb 1999 to 24 Mar 1999
EL - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 15 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Mar 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2000 |