THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:00:37 PM
Farjalla, Salaheddin Goma
CPSO#:
72935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1825 Provincial Rd
Unite 02
Windsor ON N8W 5V7
Phone: 5199715364
Fax: 5199718639
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:08 Nov 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALAHEDDIN GOMA FARJALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARJALLA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 16 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 17 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 16 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 17 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2004 |